SD HB1233 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a parole hearing requirement for certain inmates.
Title
Establish a parole hearing requirement for certain inmates.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Karr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 329 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 13. H.J. 436 |
2022-02-16 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2022-02-16 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1233B |
2022-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |