SD HB1204 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 633
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 633
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding power of attorney.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding power of attorney.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Tabled (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 633 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 527 |
2018-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 21. H.J. 497 |
2018-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 497 Amendment 1204xa |
2018-02-14 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 454 |
2018-02-14 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1204wa |
2018-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 199 |