SD HB1204 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a sales and use tax exemption for certain nonprofit corporations created for the purpose of fire protection.
Title
Provide a sales and use tax exemption for certain nonprofit corporations created for the purpose of fire protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 H.J. 880 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2016 H.J. 845 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 577 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 807 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 531 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 514 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 496 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 467 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 361 |
2016-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 451 |
2016-02-16 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-16 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1204fa |
2016-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 259 |