SD HB1193 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 548
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 548
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend provisions of the Uniform Commercial Code.
Title
Amend provisions of the Uniform Commercial Code.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Stevens [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Rep. David Kull [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - Veto override (Y: 30 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 548 |
2023-03-27 | House | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 37. H.J. 547 |
2023-03-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 546 |
2023-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2023 H.J. 509 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 447 |
2023-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 489 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 9. S.J. 389 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 43 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 261 |
2023-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 284 |
2023-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 277 |
2023-02-08 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 3 |
2023-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 195 |