SD HB1161 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 H.J. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 H.J. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate the acceptance of a central bank digital currency.
Title
Regulate the acceptance of a central bank digital currency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 H.J. 410 |
2024-02-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 22, 2024 H.J. 372 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 380 |
2024-02-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 362 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 346 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 270 |
2024-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 248 |
2024-02-02 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 1 |
2024-02-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 176 |