SD HB1151 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a peer support services program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create a peer support services program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Tabled (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseCommittee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-17HouseCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1151A
2021-02-17HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-09HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6.
2021-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseReferred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 178
2021-01-28HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 148

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback