SD HB1143 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize certain municipalities to offer limited incentives for industrial development.
Title
Authorize certain municipalities to offer limited incentives for industrial development.
Sponsors
Rep. David Anderson [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] |
Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Jess Olson [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 527 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 450 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 421 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 250 |
2021-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 277 |
2021-02-09 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 178 |
2021-01-28 | House | First Reading House H.J. 148 |