SD HB1137 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Permit the secretary of state to cancel a trademark or service mark registration under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit the secretary of state to cancel a trademark or service mark registration under certain conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Veto override (Y: 2 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-08 Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 755
2010-03-04 Veto override, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 64. H.J. 696
2010-03-03 Vetoed by the Governor H.J. 668
2010-02-25 Delivered to the Governor H.J. 618
2010-02-24 Signed by President S.J. 469
2010-02-23 Signed by Speaker H.J. 591
2010-02-22 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 412
2010-02-19 Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 389
2010-02-18 Placed on consent, Passed
2010-02-18 Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 363
2010-02-18 Scheduled for hearing
2010-02-10 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 279
2010-02-09 House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 326
2010-02-04 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 317
2010-02-03 Placed on consent, Passed
2010-02-03 Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 284
2010-02-03 Scheduled for hearing
2010-01-27 First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 196

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback