SD HB1126 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permit an alternative delivery method for issuance of a policy by an insurer.
Title
Permit an alternative delivery method for issuance of a policy by an insurer.
Sponsors
Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Eric Emery [D] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] |
Sen. Steve Kolbeck [R] | Rep. Lance Koth [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] |
Rep. Neal Pinnow [R] | Rep. Rebecca Reimer [R] | Rep. Kenneth Teunissen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420 |
2024-02-26 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2024 H.J. 396 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 405 |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 381 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 376 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 221 |
2024-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 199 |
2024-01-29 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-29 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 144 |