SD HB1120 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions and assessments related to the South Dakota Oilseeds Council.
Title
Revise certain provisions and assessments related to the South Dakota Oilseeds Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Signed by Governor H.J. 612 | |
2010-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 591 | |
2010-02-19 | Signed by President S.J. 390 | |
2010-02-18 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 476 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 358 | |
2010-02-16 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 326 | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 279 | |
2010-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 336 | |
2010-02-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 317 | |
2010-02-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 254 | |
2010-02-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1120ta | |
2010-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 169 |