SD HB1100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to airport revenue bonds.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to airport revenue bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Signed by Governor H.J. 622 | |
2010-02-25 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 618 | |
2010-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 469 | |
2010-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 591 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 423 | |
2010-02-19 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 384 | |
2010-02-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 231 | |
2010-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 274 | |
2010-02-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 252 | |
2010-01-28 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 210 | |
2010-01-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 146 |