SD HB1086 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Scheduled for hearing
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Hearing: Feb 19 Senate Local Government Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal certain fees charged by a clerk of courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal certain fees charged by a clerk of courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-11SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 189
2020-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 241
2020-02-07HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-02-07HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2020-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-27HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 61

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback