SD HB1077 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2021 H.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2021 H.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for licensure by endorsement for certain licensed professionals and occupations.
Title
Provide for licensure by endorsement for certain licensed professionals and occupations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2021 H.J. 346 |
2021-02-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 17, 2021 H.J. 303 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 271 |
2021-02-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 288 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 238 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 6 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 5 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 158 |
2021-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 3. H.J. 168 |
2021-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 168 Amendment 1077B |
2021-01-27 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-27 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1077A |
2021-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 109 |