SD HB1075 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by Governor H.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by Governor H.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow certain property tax documents to be transmitted electronically.
Title
Allow certain property tax documents to be transmitted electronically.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Signed by Governor H.J. 542 | |
2012-02-16 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Signed by President S.J. 457 | |
2012-02-14 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 476 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 391 | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-10 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 358 | |
2012-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 261 | |
2012-02-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 281 | |
2012-02-01 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 280 Amendment 1075oa | |
2012-01-30 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 247 | |
2012-01-26 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 215 | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 66 |