SD HB1073 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize dentists to void certain contract terms with insurers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize dentists to void certain contract terms with insurers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseSigned by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
2021-02-25HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 398
2021-02-24SenateSigned by the President S.J. 344
2021-02-23HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 354
2021-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 304
2021-02-18SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-18SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2021-02-18SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-04SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 183
2021-02-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 196
2021-02-01HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-02-01HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1073A
2021-02-01HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-21HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 59

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback