SD HB1073 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify certain provisions relating to a court's continuing jurisdiction to revoke probation or a suspended execution of sentence.
Title
Clarify certain provisions relating to a court's continuing jurisdiction to revoke probation or a suspended execution of sentence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Signed by Governor H.J. 694 | |
2010-03-02 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 663 | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 500 | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 619 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 468 | |
2010-02-23 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 427 | |
2010-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 249 | |
2010-02-03 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 301 | |
2010-02-01 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 237 | |
2010-02-01 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1073ra | |
2010-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-19 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 109 |