SD HB1071 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Correct incorrect cross-references dealing with crimes and criminal procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correct incorrect cross-references dealing with crimes and criminal procedures.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseSigned by the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326
2021-02-17HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 17, 2021 H.J. 303
2021-02-16SenateSigned by the President S.J. 271
2021-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 288
2021-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 271
2021-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 215
2021-02-08SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 215 Amendment 1071B
2021-02-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 202
2021-02-04SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 3
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 125
2021-01-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 130
2021-01-25HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-01-25HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-21HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 59
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 52

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback