SD HB1057 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions imposing the inheritance tax and the estate tax.
Title
Repeal certain provisions imposing the inheritance tax and the estate tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 388 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 384 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 276 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 342 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 244 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 222 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 159 |
2014-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 126 |
2014-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 109 |
2014-01-23 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 77 |
2014-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 26 |