SD HB1047 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to military law.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to military law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Signed by Governor H.J. 708 | |
2012-02-24 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 485 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 463 | |
2012-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 157 | |
2012-01-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 162 | |
2012-01-20 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-20 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 72 | |
2012-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 24 |