SD HB1045 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding alternative apportionment methods available for determination of the bank franchise tax.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding alternative apportionment methods available for determination of the bank franchise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 843 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 837 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 815 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 757 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 653 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 597 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1045jb |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 521 |
2013-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 26. H.J. 456 |
2013-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 437 |
2013-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 425 |
2013-02-13 | House | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1045ota |
2013-02-13 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 364 |
2013-02-13 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1045oa |
2013-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 29 |