SD HB1040 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 54-4)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish certain provisions regarding the opportunity scholarship program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish certain provisions regarding the opportunity scholarship program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSigned by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
2019-02-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 11, 2019 H.J. 350
2019-02-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 320
2019-02-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 334
2019-02-06SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 307
2019-01-31SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 255
2019-01-29SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 207
2019-01-29SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040cd
2019-01-29SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040ja
2019-01-29SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 107
2019-01-15HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 70
2019-01-14HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 44
2019-01-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-10HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 36

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1040&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1040P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1040SED.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1040ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27114&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27195&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27563&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27746&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27856&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback