SD HB1040 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 55-3)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 55-3)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain provisions regarding the opportunity scholarship program.
Title
Establish certain provisions regarding the opportunity scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 11, 2019 H.J. 350 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 320 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 334 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 307 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 255 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 207 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040cd |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040ja |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 107 |
2019-01-15 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 70 |
2019-01-14 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 44 |
2019-01-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 36 |