SD HB1034 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain youth hunting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain youth hunting requirements.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseSigned by the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 396
2021-02-23HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 23, 2021 H.J. 353
2021-02-22SenateSigned by the President S.J. 318
2021-02-18HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 321
2021-02-17SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 284
2021-02-16SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
2021-02-16SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-05SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 201
2021-02-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 13. H.J. 217
2021-02-03HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 189
2021-01-25HouseFiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 118
2021-01-25HouseRemove from Consent Calendar H.J. 120
2021-01-21HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-01-21HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-01-21HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1034A
2021-01-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 1

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback