SD HB1022 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the limitations on indemnification by the state.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the limitations on indemnification by the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 675 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 661 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 600 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 518 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1022wa |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 279 |
2019-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 293 |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 247 |
2019-01-30 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1022yb |
2019-01-30 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1022ya |
2019-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 21 |