SD HB1022 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and repeal certain provisions relating to education service agencies.
Title
Revise and repeal certain provisions relating to education service agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 08, 2017 H.J. 352 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 333 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 314 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 300 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 267 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 134 |
2017-01-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 75 |
2017-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 72 |
2017-01-13 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 49 |
2017-01-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 21 |