SD HB1014 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2023 H.J. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2023 H.J. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update provisions related to the licensure of speech-language pathologists and speech-language pathology assistants.
Title
Update provisions related to the licensure of speech-language pathologists and speech-language pathology assistants.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2023 H.J. 280 |
2023-02-03 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 03, 2023 H.J. 218 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 183 |
2023-02-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 201 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 141 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 122 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 68 |
2023-01-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 55 |
2023-01-17 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. |
2023-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 24 |
2023-01-10 | House | First Reading House H.J. 14 |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Executive/Judiciary Request
Health Care
Professions and Occupations
Promulgation of Rules
Executive/Judiciary Request
Health Care
Professions and Occupations
Promulgation of Rules