SD HB1009 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Signed by the Governor on February 16, 2021 H.J. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the licensing of electricians and electrical contractors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the licensing of electricians and electrical contractors.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseSigned by the Governor on February 16, 2021 H.J. 293
2021-02-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 270
2021-02-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 229
2021-02-08HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 247
2021-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 201
2021-02-04SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-04SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 143
2021-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 155
2021-01-27HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-01-27HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2021-01-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback