SD HB1004 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the registration requirement for medical assistants.
Title
Repeal the registration requirement for medical assistants.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 260 |
2021-02-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 05, 2021 H.J. 225 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 187 |
2021-02-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 186 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 158 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 102 |
2021-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 112 |
2021-01-21 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 13 |