SC S962 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Veto sustained Yeas-0 Nays-45 SJ-46
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Veto sustained Yeas-0 Nays-45 SJ-46
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 17-5-115 SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT A DEPUTY CORONER MAY BE TRAINED AND CLASSIFIED AS A CLASS III OFFICER, AND PROVIDE THAT A DEPUTY CORONER WHO IS A CLASS III OFFICER MAY NOT ENFORCE THE STATE'S GENERAL CRIMINAL LAWS; AND TO AMEND SECTION 17-5-130, RELATING TO QUALIFICATIONS FOR A PERSON TO BECOME A CORONER, SO AS TO REVISE THE LIST OF QUALIFICATIONS, TO ESTABLISH THE PROCEDURES FOR FILING TO BECOME A CANDIDATE FOR THE OFFICE OF CORONER, AND TO PROVIDE THE QUALIFICATIONS FOR A PERSON TO BECOME A DEPUTY CORONER. - ratified title
Title
Revise The List Of Qualifications, To Establish The Procedures For Filing To Become A Candidate For The Office Of Coroner, And To Provide The Qualifications For A Person To Become A Deputy Coroner. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ford [D] | Sen. John Knotts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Veto sustained Yeas-0 Nays-45 SJ-46 | |
2010-06-07 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Ratified R 256 | |
2010-05-26 | Read third time and enrolled HJ-9 | |
2010-05-25 | Read second time HJ-31 | |
2010-05-20 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, May 25, 2010 HJ-70 | |
2010-05-12 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary HJ-24 | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-22 | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced and read first time HJ-22 | |
2010-03-24 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-25 | |
2010-03-24 | Amended SJ-25 | |
2010-03-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-18 | Read second time SJ-11 | |
2010-03-18 | Amended SJ-11 | |
2010-03-17 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary SJ-9 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-36 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and read first time SJ-36 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-12-09 | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=962&session=118 |