SC S796 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-13 - Rejected HJ-26
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-13 - Rejected HJ-26
Summary
A BILL TO DIRECT THE FAIRFIELD COUNTY TREASURER TO TRANSFER A SPECIFIED AMOUNT OF FUNDS TO CHESTER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT IN ORDER TO DEFRAY THE COSTS TO EDUCATE CERTAIN STUDENTS WHO RESIDE IN FAIRFIELD COUNTY BUT ATTEND CHESTER COUNTY SCHOOLS, AND TO REQUIRE THAT THE AMOUNT OF FUNDS DELIVERED TO CHESTER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT BE REEXAMINED EVERY THREE YEARS AND AN AGREEMENT BE ENTERED INTO BETWEEN THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF FAIRFIELD COUNTY AND CHESTER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT FOR THE PAYMENT OF THOSE FUNDS.
Title
A Bill To Direct The Fairfield County Treasurer To Transfer A Specified Amount Of Funds To Chester County School District In Order To Defray The Costs To Educate Certain Students Who Reside In Fairfield County But Attend Chester County Schools, And To Require That The Amount Of Funds Delivered To Chester County School District Be Reexamined Every Three Years And An Agreement Be Entered Into Between The School District Of Fairfield County And Chester County School District For The Payment Of Those Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-13 | Rejected HJ-26 | |
2009-05-19 | Debate adjourned until Friday, May 22, 2009 HJ-35 | |
2009-05-19 | Reconsidered HJ-35 | |
2009-05-14 | Motion noted- Rep. TR Young moved to reconsider the vote whereby read third time and enrolled | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time and enrolled HJ-28 | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time HJ-8 | |
2009-05-12 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-14 | |
2009-05-08 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-1 | |
2009-05-07 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day SJ-8 | |
2009-05-07 | Read second time SJ-8 | |
2009-05-07 | Recalled from Committee on Education SJ-8 | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Committee on Education SJ-6 | |
2009-05-06 | Introduced and read first time SJ-6 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=796&session=118 |