SC S426 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Knotts, Campsen, Lourie
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Knotts, Campsen, Lourie
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 20-1-110 SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT COMMON-LAW MARRIAGE IN THE STATE MAY NOT BE RECOGNIZED ON AND AFTER JANUARY 1, 2010, AND TO PROVIDE AN EXCEPTION FOR A COMMON-LAW MARRIAGE EXISTING AS OF DECEMBER 31, 2009; AND TO REPEAL SECTION 20-1-360 RELATING TO THE VALIDITY OF A MARRIAGE CONTRACTED WITHOUT THE ISSUANCE OF A LICENSE.
Title
Provide That Common-law Marriage In The State May Not Be Recognized On And After January 1, 2010, And To Provide An Exception For A Common-law Marriage Existing As Of December 31, 2009; And To Repeal Section 20-1-360 Relating To The Validity Of A Marriage Contracted Without The Issuance Of A License.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-20 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Knotts, Campsen, Lourie | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-3 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced and read first time SJ-3 |
Same As/Similar To
H3167 (Similar To) 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-75
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0426&session=118 |