SC S1360 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence HJ-28
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence HJ-28
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO EXPRESS THE BELIEF OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY THAT NASCAR RACING IS AN INTEGRAL AND VITAL PART OF THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA AND ITS ECONOMY, TO RECOGNIZE THE DARLINGTON RACEWAY AS ONE OF OUR STATE'S MOST TREASURED ATTRACTIONS, TO IDENTIFY AND CELEBRATE SOUTH CAROLINA'S RICH NASCAR HISTORY, AND TO DECLARE THE WEEK OF MAY 3, 2010, THROUGH MAY 9, 2010, "DARLINGTON RACEWAY WEEK, THE WEEK TOO TOUGH TO TAME IN SOUTH CAROLINA".
Title
Express The Belief Of The General Assembly That Nascar Racing Is An Integral And Vital Part Of The State Of South Carolina And Its Economy, To Recognize The Darlington Raceway As One Of Our State's Most Treasured Attractions, To Identify And Celebrate South Carolina's Rich Nascar History, And To Declare The Week Of May 3, 2010, Through May 9, 2010, "darlington Raceway Week, The Week Too Tough To Tame In South Carolina".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence HJ-28 | |
2010-04-14 | Introduced, adopted, sent to House SJ-54 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1360&session=118 |