SC S1307 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of U.s. Highway 76 From The Timmonsville City Limit To Its Intersection With Interstate 95 The "reverend Dr. Henry B. Peoples Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers And Signs Along This Portion Of Highway That Contain This Designation.
Title
Reverend Dr. Henry B. Peoples Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-05-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-05-25 | House | Introduced |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Introduced |