SC S1195 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-25 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-9
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-25 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-9
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO APPROVE REGULATIONS OF THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES, RELATING TO REGULATIONS FOR SPECIES OR SUBSPECIES OF NON-GAME WILDLIFE, DESIGNATED AS REGULATION DOCUMENT NUMBER 4069, PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF ARTICLE 1, CHAPTER 23, TITLE 1 OF THE 1976 CODE.
Title
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Natural Resources, Relating To Regulations For Species Or Subspecies Of Non-game Wildlife, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4069, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-9 | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced and read first time HJ-9 | |
2010-02-24 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-13 | |
2010-02-23 | Read second time SJ-17 | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference SJ-2 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1195&session=118 |