SC S1179 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 40-63-30, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Licensure Of Social Workers, So As To Clarify That Social Workers Licensed In This State May Provide Services Within Their Scope Of Practice Through Telephonic, Electronic, Or Other Means; By Adding Section 40-63-35 So As To Authorize Independent Clinical Practice Social Workers Licensed In Other States Or Jurisdictions To Provide Independent Social Work Services By Means Of Behavioral Telehealth To Clients Located In This State If Registered In This State And Providing Services Within Their Scope Of Practice, And To Provide Related Definitions And Requirements; And By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 75, Title 40 So As To Authorize Professional Counselors, Addiction Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists, And Licensed Psycho-educational Specialists Services In Other States Or Jurisdictions To Provide Their Professional Services By Means Of Behavioral Telehealth To Clients Located In This State If Registered In This State And Providing Services Within Their Applicable Scope Of Practice, And To Provide Related Definitions And Requirements. - Ratified Title
Title
Telehealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 155 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 06/12/22 | |
2022-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 188 | |
2022-05-04 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2022-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-13 |
2022-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-04-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-04-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |