SC S1148 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Act No. 249
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Act No. 249
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND CHAPTER 28, TITLE 40, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE REGULATION OF LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS, SO AS TO CONFORM THE CHAPTER TO THE STATUTORY ORGANIZATIONAL FRAMEWORK OF CHAPTER 1, TITLE 40 FOR PROFESSIONS AND OCCUPATIONS UNDER THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, LICENSING AND REGULATION; AND, AMONG OTHER THINGS, TO TRANSFER THE OVERSIGHT AND REGULATION OF LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS FROM THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES TO THE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, LICENSING AND REGULATION; TO CREATE THE BOARD OF LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURAL EXAMINERS, TO PROVIDE FOR ITS MEMBERS, POWERS, AND DUTIES, AND TO TRANSFER THE POWERS AND DUTIES OF THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES TO THE BOARD; TO PROVIDE THAT LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS MUST BE LICENSED RATHER THAN REGISTERED, TO PROVIDE FOR AN EMERITUS LANDSCAPE ARCHITECT, AND TO FURTHER PROVIDE THAT THE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, LICENSING AND REGULATION SHALL ADMINISTER THE PROGRAM FOR LICENSURE OF LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS; TO REVISE CERTAIN LICENSURE REQUIREMENTS; TO FURTHER PROVIDE FOR A FIRM TO OBTAIN A CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO ALLOW AN INDIVIDUAL LANDSCAPE ARCHITECT TO PRACTICE THROUGH A FIRM OFFERING LANDSCAPE ARCHITECT SERVICES; AND TO AMEND CHAPTER 65, TITLE 40, RELATING TO THE REGULATION OF PROFESSIONAL SOIL CLASSIFIERS, SO AS TO CONFORM THIS CHAPTER TO THE STATUTORY ORGANIZATIONAL FRAMEWORK OF CHAPTER 1, TITLE 40 FOR PROFESSIONS AND OCCUPATIONS UNDER THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, LICENSING AND REGULATION; AND, AMONG OTHER THINGS, TO PROVIDE THAT PERSONS ENGAGING IN PROFESSIONAL SOIL CLASSIFICATION MUST BE LICENSED, RATHER THAN REGISTERED; TO REVISE QUALIFICATIONS FOR LICENSURE; TO PROVIDE GRANDFATHERING PROVISIONS FOR REGISTERED PROFESSIONAL SOIL CLASSIFIERS TO BECOME LICENSED PROFESSIONAL SOIL CLASSIFIERS UPON THE NEXT RENEWAL OF THEIR REGISTRATION; AND TO FURTHER PROVIDE FOR THE LICENSURE AND REGULATION OF PROFESSIONAL SOIL CLASSIFIERS; AND TO REQUIRE THE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, LICENSING AND REGULATION TO PROVIDE THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY WITH CERTAIN FINANCIAL INFORMATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE COSTS ON EACH PROFESSION AND OCCUPATION UNDER THE DEPARTMENT. - ratified title
Title
Conform This Chapter To The Statutory Organizational Framework Of Chapter 1, Title 40 For Professions And Occupations Under The Administration Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation; And, Among Other Things, To Provide That Persons Engaging In Professional Soil Classification Must Be Licensed, Rather Than Registered; To Revise Qualifications For Licensure; To Provide Grandfathering Provisions For Registered Professional Soil Classifiers To Become Licensed Professional Soil Classifiers Upon The Next Renewal Of Their Registration; And To Further Provide For The Licensure And Regulation Of Professional Soil Classifiers; And To Require The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation To Provide The General Assembly With Certain Financial Information And Administrative Costs On Each Profession And Occupation Under The Department. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Act No. 249 | |
2010-07-01 | Effective date 06/11/10 | |
2010-06-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 310 | |
2010-06-03 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled SJ-57 | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-6 | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time HJ-40 | |
2010-06-01 | Amended HJ-40 | |
2010-05-26 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-3 | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-31 | |
2010-05-06 | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-31 | |
2010-05-04 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-31 | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced and read first time HJ-30 | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-28 | |
2010-04-29 | Amended SJ-28 | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time SJ-48 | |
2010-04-28 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted SJ-48 | |
2010-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-27 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry SJ-10 | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry SJ-7 | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced and read first time SJ-7 |
Same As/Similar To
H4673 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-4
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1148&session=118 |