SC S1147 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For Expedited Hearings In The Case Of Missing Persons Under Certain Circumstances.
Title
Protective proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2014-05-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Malloy, Bennett |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H5013 (Similar To) 2014-04-01 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary