SC S1053 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorize Palmetto Girls State To Use The Chambers Of The Senate And The House Of Representatives On Friday, June 15, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Palmetto Girls' State

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseIntroduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
2018-03-20SenateAdopted, sent to House
2018-03-15SenateCommittee report: Favorable Invitations
2018-03-15SenatePolled out of committee Invitations
2018-02-27SenateReferred to Committee on Invitations
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback