SC S1045 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 58-23-20, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Regulations For Transportation By Motor Vehicles For Compensation, So As To Provide For The Transportation Of Hazardous Waste For Disposal Or Household Goods And Exceptions; To Amend Section 58-23-25, Relating To The Public Service Commission's Motor Carrier Regulatory Authority, So As To Provide For The Statutory Construction Of The Chapter Related To The Limitation Of Certain Authority Vested With Public Service Commission's Motor Carrier Regulatory Authority; To Amend Section 58-23-30, Relating To The Definition Of "for Compensation", So As To Properly Define Transportation Vehicles; To Amend Section 58-23-40, Relating To Certificate And Fee Requirements, So As To Properly Define Transportation Vehicles; To Amend Section 58-23-60, Relating To Areas In Which This Chapter Is Not Applicable To Businesses, So As To Include Vehicles Operated By A Municipality; To Amend Sections 58-23-210, 58-23-220, 58-23-230, 58-23-240, 58-23-250, 58-23-260, 58-23-270, And 58-23-290, All Relating To Classes Of Certificates, All So As To Provide The Manner In Which The Office Of Regulatory Staff Issues Class Certificates; To Amend Section 58-23-560, Relating To License Fees For Certificate Holders, So As To Provide Eligibility Regulations For Certificate Holders; To Amend Section 58-23-590, Relating To Carriers Of Household Goods And Hazardous Waste For Disposal, So As To Provide The Powers Of The Commission; To Amend Section 58-23-600, Relating To Time For Payment Of Fees, So As To Provide Regulations For Fees Required Of Certificate Holders; To Amend Section 58-23-910, Relating To Insurance And Bond, So As To Provide Insurance Requirements; To Amend Section 58-23-930, Relating To Exceptions For The Requirement Of Insurance, So As To Remove References To The Interstate Commerce Commission; To Amend Sections 58-23-1010, 58-23-1020, 58-23-1080, And 58-23-1090, Relating To Rights And Duties Generally, So As To Provide For Regulations For Fees, Licenses, And Other Markers; To Amend Section 58-4-60, Relating To Expenses Borne By Regulated Utilities, So As To Reference The Provisions In The Code Generating Fees That Are To Be Used To Pay For The Expenses Of The Transportation Department Of The Office Of Regulatory Staff; To Amend Section 4-11-290, Relating To The Dissolution Of Special Purpose Districts, So As To Provide For The Dissolution Of A Hospital District That Has An Affiliated Organization Exempt From Tax Under Section 501(c)(3) Or (4); To Repeal Sections 58-23-300, 58-23-330, 58-23-530, 58-23-540, 58-23-550, And 58-23-1060; And To Require The Public Service Commission To Make Information Readily Available To The Public. - Ratified Title
Title
Motor vehicle carriers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Act No. 214 | |
2022-06-01 | Effective date 05/23/22 | |
2022-05-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-18 | Ratified R 242 | |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-11 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2022-05-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | House | Amended |
2022-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-04-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-04-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campsen, Matthews, Talley |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 11 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 1010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 1020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 1060 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 1080 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 1090 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 540 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 560 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 590 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 23 | 930 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 4 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |