SC S1021 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Provisions Of The South Carolina Abandoned Buildings Revitalization Act To 2035; And To Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 12-67-140, Relating To The Abandoned Buildings Tax Credit, So As To Increase The Amount Of The Maximum Tax Credit That May Be Earned.
Title
Abandoned buildings tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |