SC S0969 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 177
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 177
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-1-325 So As To Provide Every Public School Shall Display Depictions Of The Respective Flags And Mottos Of The United States And South Carolina Before January 1, 2023, To Provide Related Requirements Of The State Board Of Education And Public Schools, And To Make These Provisions Applicable To Private Schools That Receive Any Public Funding; By Adding Section 59-1-465 So As To Provide Public School Principals Shall Allow Youth Patriotic Society Representatives To Address Students On Certain Topics During Patriot Day, Constitution Day, Or Patriotism Week Events, To Provide Related Implementation Provisions, And To Define Related Terms; And To Amend Section 53-3-150, Relating To Patriotism Week Observations, So As To Make Such Observations Mandatory In Public School Districts And To Include Mandatory Observations For Patriot Day And Constitution Day, Among Other Things. - Ratified Title
Title
Board of Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 81 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 81 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 177 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 07/01/23 | |
2022-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 181 | |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-11 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2022-05-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | House | Amended |
2022-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-04-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3064 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 3 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 465 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |