SC H3064 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-1-325 So As To Authorize The State Board Of Education To Make Rules And Regulations To Require The Display Of The Official Mottos Of The United States Of America And South Carolina.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham, Oremus, McGarry
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591325(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback