SC S0948 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Move The Date Of The 2022 Election For The Marion County Board Of Education From The Second Tuesday In April Of 2022 To The Second Tuesday In May Of 2022, And To Adjust The Candidate Filing Period Accordingly. - Ratified Title
Title
Marion County Board of Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House: Override Veto By The Governor (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 24 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | Act No. 260 | |
2022-02-15 | Effective date 02/09/22 | |
2022-02-09 | House | Veto overridden Yeas-90 Nays-1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Veto overridden by originating body Ayes-35 Nays-0 |
2022-02-01 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-01-26 | Ratified R 122 | |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2022-01-21 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-01-20 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2022-01-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-0 |
2022-01-20 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Amended |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |