SC S0805 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Make Conforming Changes; And To Repeal Article 11 Of Chapter 11, Title 63 Relating To The Children's Case Resolution System

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Advocacy Department

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14 Act No. 160
2018-05-09 Effective date 07/01/2019
2018-05-03 Signed By Governor
2018-05-01 Ratified R 171
2018-04-25HouseRead third time and enrolled
2018-04-24HouseRoll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
2018-04-24HouseRead second time
2018-04-24HouseReconsidered
2018-04-24HouseAmended
2018-04-18HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2018-03-20HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-20HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-14 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-03-13SenateAmended
2018-03-07SenateRead second time
2018-02-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-21SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-02-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-14SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment General
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on General
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-12-06SenateReferred to Committee on General
2017-12-06SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0794 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on General
S0795 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on General
S0797 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
S0798 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Finance
H4674 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11110(n/a)See Bill Text
13240(n/a)See Bill Text
1360(n/a)See Bill Text
593620(n/a)See Bill Text
63111310(n/a)See Bill Text
63111340(n/a)See Bill Text
63111360(n/a)See Bill Text
63111510(n/a)See Bill Text
63111930(n/a)See Bill Text
6311500(n/a)See Bill Text
6311540(n/a)See Bill Text
6311700(n/a)See Bill Text
6311730(n/a)See Bill Text
6371990(n/a)See Bill Text
637360(n/a)See Bill Text
637370(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback