SC S0798 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Bill To Amend The First Undesignated Paragraph In Section 11-35-5270, Relating To The Division Of Small And Minority Business Contracting And Certification, To Provide That The Division Of Small And Minority Business Contracting And Certification Must Be Established Within The State Fiscal Accountability Authority; And To Amend Section 1-11-10(a), Relating To The Composition Of The Department Of Administration, To Conform To The Transfer Of The Division Of Small And Minority Business Contracting And Certification To The State Fiscal Accountability Authority.
Title
Small and minority business contracting and certification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0794 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on General
S0795 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on General
S0797 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
S0805 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Act No. 160
H4674 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0795 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on General
S0797 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
S0805 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Act No. 160
H4674 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0798&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/798_20171206.htm |