SC S0771 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidate Bamberg-ehrhardt School District One (also Known As Bamberg School District One) And Denmark-olar School District Two (also Known As Bamberg School District Two) Into One School District To Be Known As The Bamberg County School District; To Abolish Bamberg-ehrhardt School District One And Denmark-olar School District Two On July 1, 2022; To Provide That The Bamberg County School District Must Be Governed By A Board Of Trustees Consisting Of Nine Members, Which Initially Must Be Appointed By The Bamberg County Legislative Delegation, To Provide That Beginning In 2024, The Initial Nine-member Appointed Board Shall Begin The Process Of Transitioning To A Nine-member Elected Board Of Trustees By Electing Four Members To Serve Four-year Terms From Single-member Election Districts 2, 4, 6, And 8 In Nonpartisan Elections To Be Conducted At The Same Time As The 2024 General Election; To Establish Continuity Of Leadership Provisions By Requiring The Bamberg County Legislative Delegation To Select Five Members From The Initial Nine-member Appointed Board To Serve Alongside The Four Members Elected In 2024 Until The Five Appointed Members' Successors Are Elected To Serve Four-year Terms From Single-member Election Districts 1, 3, 5, 7, And 9 In Nonpartisan Elections To Be Conducted At The Same Time As The 2026 General Election, And, Thereafter, To Provide That Members Of The Bamberg County School District Board Of Trustees Must Be Elected In Nonpartisan School District Elections To Be Conducted At The Same Time As The General Election For Terms Of Four Years And Until Their Successors Are Elected And Qualify, Except As Provided In This Act To Stagger The Members' Terms; To Establish The Board's Powers, Duties, And Responsibilities; To Provide That The District Superintendent Is The Chief Operating Officer Of The District And Is Responsible To The Board For The Proper Administration Of All Affairs Of The District And Subject To All Other Provisions Of Law Relating To His Duties; To Establish Interim Millage Provisions Until 2027 When The Bamberg County School District Shall Assume Total Fiscal Autonomy; To Transfer The Assets And Liabilities Of Bamberg-ehrhardt School District One And Denmark-olar School District Two To The Bamberg School District On July 1, 2022; And To Repeal All Local Acts Inconsistent With The Provisions Of This Act. - Ratified Title
Title
Consolidation of Bamberg School District 1 with Bamberg School District 2
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 18 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Act No. 104 | |
2021-07-12 | Effective date 07/24/21 | |
2021-06-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-06-21 | Ratified R 115 | |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2021-06-21 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-06-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-06-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-3 |
2021-06-09 | House | Read second time |
2021-06-09 | House | Amended |
2021-06-08 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Bamberg Delegation |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Bamberg Delegation |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |