SC S0610 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Enacting The "professional Counseling Compact Act" By Adding Article 6 To Chapter 75, Title 40 So As To Provide The Purpose, Functions, Operations, And Definitions For The Compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Counseling Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2023-05-02HouseIntroduced and read first time
2023-04-26SenateRead third time and sent to House
2023-04-25SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2023-04-25SenateRead second time
2023-04-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-04-19SenateCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2023-04-18 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-03-08SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2023-03-08SenateIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback