SC S0603 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Authorize The Greenville Young Men's Christian Association To Use The Chamber Of The South Carolina Senate And Any Available Committee Hearing Rooms In The Gressette Building For Its Youth In Government Program On Monday, November 18 And Thursday, November 21 And Friday, November 22, 2019. However, The Chamber May Not Be Used If The Senate Is In Session Or The Chamber Is Otherwise Unavailable.
Title
Greenville Young Men's Christian Association to use Chamber
Sponsors
Sen. Ross Turner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Operations and Management |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Polled out of committee Operations and Management |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Operations and Management |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |