SC S0527 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-43-220, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Classification Of Property And The Applicable Assessment Ratios For The Various Classes Of Property, So As To Provide That Certain Separated Spouses Are Not Considered Members Of The Same Household For Purposes Of Applicability For The Special Four-percent Assessment Ratio For Owner-occupied Residential Property, And To Require Annual Reapplication And Recertification To Maintain The Special Four Percent Assessment Ratio For Certain Separated Spouses. - Ratified Title
Title
Legally separated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 56 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/17/21 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 70 | |
2021-05-12 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-3 |
2021-05-11 | House | Read second time |
2021-05-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-11-21 |
2021-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-8 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |