SC S0512 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Wilful Damage To A Water System, To Provide Different Penalties For Violations Of The Section Based Upon The Amount Of Property Damage; And To Provide That All Offenses Of This Nature Shall Be Subject To This Penalty.
Title
Wilful damage to a water system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: McElveen (ch), Thurmond, Turner |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |